This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 02:16:16 (UTC).

JAN HERNANDEZ -V- BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 JAN HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0418

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAN HERNANDEZ

Defendant

BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MIRROKNIAN LAWFIRM

15260 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1740

Sherman Oaks, CA 91430

Defendant Attorney

VARNER & BRANDT

3750 University Ave Suite 610

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP WITH VARNER & BRANDT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP WITH VARNER & BRANDT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

ANSWER FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC., SERVED ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC., SERVED ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JACKEE MONTANO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAN HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY JEFF OLSEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; COUNSEL WILL DISCUSS ADR OPTIONS INCLUDING THE POSSIBILITY OF A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT; CONFERENCE.; DEFENDANT MAY FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JACKEE MONTANO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAN HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY JEFF OLSEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; COUNSEL WILL DISCUSS ADR AND TRIAL DATES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HIDER AL-MASHAT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAN HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY RICHARD D MARCA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING IS CONTINUED. DEFENSE COUNSEL RECENTLY SUBSTITUTED INTO THIS CASE AND PARTIES ARE; ENGAGED IN DISCOVERY.; COUNSELS ARE ENCOURAGED TO HAVE PRELIMINARY DISCUSSIONS REGARDING ADR. COURT WILL BE; INTERESTED TO KNOW IF PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO MEDIATION OR PARTICIPATE IN A MANDATORY; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP WITH VARNER & BRANDT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC., FOR FAX FILING, COPY,PSTG/EVLP; Minutes; Receipt: 171016-0362 $4.21; 171016-0362-VS Reference Number 03299G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HIDER AL-MASHAT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAN HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY ERIC E OSTLING APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; COUNSEL REPRESENT THEY INTEND TO MEET AND CONFER TO DISCUSS POSSIBLE ADR AND/OR MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HIDER AL-MASHAT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAN HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY ERIC E. OSTLING APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; MATTER IS CONTINUED.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS WRITTEN DISCOVERY IS CURRENTLY BEING PROPOUNDED.; COUNSEL TO HAVE INFORMAL DISCUSSIONS REGARDING MEDIATION OR SCHEDULING AN MSC WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DEFENDANT BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC., FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC.,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FLOYD SKEREN & KELLY LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC., SERVED ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 026-0001019897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAN HERNANDEZ FOR FIRST PAPER/FAX FILING/ENV/POST/COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161206-0002 $459.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less