This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:26:43 (UTC).

JAMES SCOTT MOSELY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 JAMES SCOTT MOSELY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0727

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ROBERT L. MOSELY

ROBERT L. MOSLEY

Defendant

JAMES SCOTT MOSLEY

Decedent

JAMES S. MOSLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HARTNELL, BRYAN C

25757 Redlands Blvd

Redlands, CA 92373

HARTNELL LAW GROUP

25757 Redlands Blvd

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ROBERT L MOSLEY APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, BM GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ROBERT L MOSLEY APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, BM GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 7/27, 8/3, 8/10/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 7/27, 8/3, 8/10/17 FILED.

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE PETITION FOR EARLY SETTING FILED

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE PETITION FOR EARLY SETTING FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT L. MOSELY

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT L. MOSELY

EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING EARLY SETTING FILED.

EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING EARLY SETTING FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ACCOUNTING REVIEW FILED 05/15/2018 OF ROBERT MOSLEY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • ORDER JUDGMENT SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ROBERT L. MOSELY AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRYAN HARTNELL (AFTER HEARING) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 07/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON REVISED JUDGMENT SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO AND RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES ON FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING EARLY SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRYAN HARTNELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED; EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; VACATE PRLTR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; HEARING RE: PTN FOR LTS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA SET FOR 08/16/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ROBERT L. MOSELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON GRANTING EARLY SETTING RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING EARLY SETTING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0694 $465.00; 170721-0694-CK Reference Number 10212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT L. MOSELY FOR EXPARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING EARLY SETTING; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0698 $90.00; 170721-0698-CK Reference Number 10212

    Read MoreRead Less