Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 04:34:45 (UTC).

JAMES LEE ADAMS -V- CENTURY QUALITY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2011 JAMES LEE ADAMS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CENTURY QUALITY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6418

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES LEE ADAMS

Defendants

SAM MENLO

CENTURY QUALITY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CENTER FOR DISABILITY ACCESS, LLP

9845 Erma Road Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorney

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK &MARTHA

225 Broadway Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 10/02/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER KAREN CUELLAR 13210; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; KRYSTLE BERKSTRESSER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CENTURY QUALITY MANAGEMENT, INC., SAM MENLO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT.; COUNSEL IS AWAITING RECEIPT OF THE SIGNED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PRIOR TO DISBURSING SETTLEMENT; FUNDS; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 11/02/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36; COUNSEL FOR DEFEDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES BOYD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ERIC LEENERTS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; SETTLED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION.; SETTLEMENT IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; COURT ORDERS TRIAL DATES VACATE AND MATTER SET FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL TO ALLOW THE EXCHANGE OF; SETTLEMENT DRAFTS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 09/28/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36; VACATE READI HEARING ON 10/11/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.; VACATE JT HEARING ON 10/15/12 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S36.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CENTURY QUALITY MANAGEMENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/02/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SAM MENLO SERVED ON 06/09/11 WITH FEES OF $90.64.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/05/2011 OF JAMES ADAMS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JAMES LEE ADAMS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JAMES LEE ADAMS FOR NEW COMPLAINT/FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JAMES LEE ADAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY QUALITY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant