This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:26:05 (UTC).

JAMES CAMPANIS -V- JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 JAMES CAMPANIS -V- JP MORGAN CHASE BANK was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3091

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES CAMPANIS JR

Defendants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NA

CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE/SANCTIONS FOR FTA; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF/TRIAL SETTING CON.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF,; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF JAMES CAMPANIS JR. IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $250.00 PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 03/08/18.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHYT THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR IN; THE ALTERNATE, WHY ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR; PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 2/8/18 HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : FAILURE TO PROSECUTE/SANCTIONS FOR FTA SET FOR 03/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 2/8/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JAMES CAMPANIS JR; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; 08:38; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY $250.00 SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR; FAILURE TO APPEAR TODAY AND FAILURE TO PROPERLY SERVE DEFENDANT.; COURT FINDS:; PROOF OF SERVICE IS NOT VALID.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF/TRIAL SETTING CON. SET FOR 02/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE ON 12/22/17 AS TO JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JAMES CAMPANIS JR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JAMES CAMPANIS JR FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JAMES CAMPANIS JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less