This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:50:48 (UTC).

JACKSON-V-N. LOMA & N. MOUNTAIN AVE (MF)

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 JACKSON-V-N LOMA N MOUNTAIN AVE MF was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3194

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONATHAN REESE

TERESA JACKSON

VIVIAN DANIELS

WILLIE STRON

RAYONNA DANIELS

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC

MELISSA TRAN

NERAM VILLAGE INC.

TRUNG NGUYEN

NERAM VILLAGE INC

N LOMA AND N MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES LLC

NERAM VILLAGE, INC

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Minors

KIYLAH REESE

JASPER REESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J. VIRAG

16400 Ventura Bl

Encino, CA 91436

MYBEDBUGLAWYER, INC

16400 Ventura Blvd Ste 301

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CLEIDIN Z ATANOUS

1940 E. Chapman Avenue Suite A

Fullerton, CA 92831

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

NILTON ANAYA

1264 S. Waterman Ave Suite 11

San Bernardino, CA 92404

ATAN0US, ESQ., CLEIDIN Z.

500 S. Kraemer Boulevard Suite 205

Brea, CA 92821

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MELISSA TRAN SERVED ON 09/16/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MELISSA TRAN SERVED ON 09/16/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MELISSA TRAN SERVED ON 09/16/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MELISSA TRAN SERVED ON 09/16/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

ANSWER FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF CLEIDIN Z ATANOUS.

ANSWER FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF CLEIDIN Z ATANOUS.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE # CIVDS1605211) FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE # CIVDS1605211) FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NERAM VILLAGE INC. SERVED ON 11/03/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NERAM VILLAGE INC. SERVED ON 11/03/16 WITH FEES OF $27.50.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON N LOMA AND N MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/16 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON N LOMA AND N MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/16 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY N LOMA AND N MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES LLC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY N LOMA AND N MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES LLC.

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TRUNG NGUYEN, MELISSA TRAN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TRUNG NGUYEN, MELISSA TRAN.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SEE MINUTE ORD RE: NTC OF RELATED CASE, CASE DEEM RELATED, CONTD TO 02/09/17 (IMAGED)

SEE MINUTE ORD RE: NTC OF RELATED CASE, CASE DEEM RELATED, CONTD TO 02/09/17 (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MELISSA TRAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $68.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MELISSA TRAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $68.00 FILED.

SEE MIN ORD RE: TSC HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/11/17 (IMAGED)

SEE MIN ORD RE: TSC HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/11/17 (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/16/18 OSC RE:SANCTIONS RE: NERAM FTA/TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/16/18 OSC RE:SANCTIONS RE: NERAM FTA/TSC FILED.

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC FILED BY N. LOMA AND N. MOUNTAIN AVE PROPERTIES, LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF VIVIAN DANIELS, RAYONNA DANIELS, WILLIE STRON, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET VIVIAN DANIELS, RAYONNA DANIELS, WILLIE STRON WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLAINTIFFS LISTED MUST BE ACTIVE ON CASE PLEASE RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF TERESA JACKSON, JONATHAN REESE, JASPER REESE, KIYLAH REESE, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; ON PLAS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET TERESA JACKSON, JONATHAN REESE, JASPER REESE, KIYLAH REESE WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SENT.; Minutes; THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S):; CANNOT DISMISS CASE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. THERE AREOTHER COMPLAINTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINTS ON FILE; AND NO ATTORNEYS SIGNATURES SIGNING OFF ON THE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0253003804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TERESA JACKSON FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160322-0711 $30.00; 160322-0711-VS Reference Number 023-0253003804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TERESA JACKSON FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 160322-0709 $435.00; 160322-0709-VS Reference Number 023-0253003804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0253003804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT TO COMPLETE NEW FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.