This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 10:15:53 (UTC).

JACKSON -V- DIAMOND VALLEY PATROL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2015 JACKSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DIAMOND VALLEY PATROL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6211

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNELL JACKSON

Defendants

DIAMOND VALLEY PATROL SPECIALIST,

WESTECH PATROL SPECIALISTS, INC.,

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID YEREMIAN & ASSOCIATES, INC

535 North Brand Boulevard Suite 705

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING & ORDER RE- M

04/29/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING & ORDER RE- M

NOTICE OF RULING AND ORDER RE-MTN TO BE RELIEVED A

04/29/2016: NOTICE OF RULING AND ORDER RE-MTN TO BE RELIEVED A

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS

04/22/2016: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS

MOTION RE- TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARI

03/21/2016: MOTION RE- TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARI

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE

03/21/2016: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CORNELL JACKS

10/13/2015: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CORNELL JACKS

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/13/2015: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

06/03/2015: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

05/05/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

05/05/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS COURT REPORTER RACHEL PARRA;13566 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF: ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketReturn Mail; Comment: RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL RECEIVED BACK FROM CORNELL JACKSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: LUANN GEESINK COURT REPORTER KERRI DAVERSA;13882 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR: - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 07/21/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23 NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketUpdate Party Address; Comment: PARTY CORNELL JACKSON UPDATED: ADDRESS/PHONE NUMBER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketAttorney of Record Changed; Comment: DAVID YEREMIAN & ASSOCIATES, INC. IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR CORNELL JACKSON, AND PRO/PER IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 04/29/2016; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING & ORDER RE: MOTION BY MAIL ON 04/28/16 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed; Comment: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CORNELL JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150505-1342; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $675.00; Total Payments and Credits: $675.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150505-1342-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 150505-1342-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 004012

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTECH PATROL SPECIALISTS INC is a litigant