This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:27:55 (UTC).

JACKMAN -V- JE & M HOME ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 JACKMAN -V- JE M HOME was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3098

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE JACKMAN

Defendants

JOSE A. UMANZOR

JE & M HOME DELIVERY INC

MANUEL SILOE CASSANSDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALDERLAW PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

TYSON & MENDES LLP

1055 West 7Th St Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANCINE B. KELLY &ASSOCIATES WITH TYSON & MENDES LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE A. UMANZOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANCINE B. KELLY &ASSOCIATES WITH TYSON & MENDES LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JE & M HOME DELIVERY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANCINE B. KELLY &ASSOCIATES WITH TYSON & MENDES LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MANUEL SILOE CASSANSDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR GEORGE JACKMAN.; Minutes; Receipt: 180529-0850 $150.00; 180529-0850-CK Reference Number 122665

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GEORGE JACKMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JE & M HOME DELIVERY INC, MANUEL SILOE CASSANSDA, JOSE A. UMANZOR FOR ADVANCE JURY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180522-1018 $150.00; 180522-1018-CK Reference Number 123164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JE & M HOME DELIVERY INC, MANUEL SILOE CASSANSDA, JOSE A. UMANZOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DANIEL S DESANTIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GEORGE JACKMAN.; ATTORNEY MICHELLE A CAMPBELL PRESENT FOR JE & M HOME DELIVERY, ET AL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING CASE STATUS. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF GIVES ESTIMATE OF MEDICAL; DAMAGES AND ANTICIPATES WAGE CLAIM. COUNSEL FURTHER ADVISES THE COURT THAT PLAINTIFF WILL; NEED TO UNDERGO ADDITIONAL SURGERY.; DEFENSE COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT OF NEED FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EVALUATION. LIABILITY TO BE; DETERMINED.; COURT ADVISES COUNSEL THIS MATTER MAY BE RESOLVED BY PRIVATE MEDIATION. COURT CONTINUES MATTER FOR; DISCOVERY AND POSSIBLE MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY JE & M HOME DELIVERY INC, MANUEL SILOE CASSANSDA, JOSE A. UMANZOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S30 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF GEORGE JACKMAN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GEORGE JACKMAN FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0034 $435.00; 170711-0034-CK Reference Number CK 34574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less