This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:25:45 (UTC).

JACKI L. GOLDIE -N- MICHAEL L. GOLDIE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 JACKI L GOLDIE -N- MICHAEL L GOLDIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5760

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACKI L GOLDIE

Respondent

MICHAEL L GOLDIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JACKI L GOLDIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JACKI L GOLDIE FOR CERTIFIED COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 180627-0501 $16.71; 180627-0501-VS Reference Number 030-0068361803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • VACATE SDEF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • VACATE HFAIL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/22 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JACKI GOLDIE AS TO MICHAEL L GOLDIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JACKI GOLDIE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF JACKI GOLDIE ORDERED ENTERED 02/05/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL L GOLDIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JACKI L GOLDIE FOR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MICHAEL L GOLDIE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JACKI L GOLDIE FOR 1ST FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JACKI L GOLDIE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JACKI L GOLDIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less