This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:05:17 (UTC).

JACINTO/RAMIREZ VS LUGO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 JACINTO/RAMIREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUGO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7671

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTIN C JACINTO

CAROLINA S RAMIREZ

Defendant

ALEJO LUGO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0890 $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEJO LUGO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEJO LUGO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; MINUTES UPDATED BY COURTNE DOUGHERTY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARTIN C JACINTO, CAROLINA S RAMIREZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEJO LUGO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 10:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • LETTER RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANT CHALLENGING VENUE DATED 10/30/17 SENT TO F6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • LETTER RE:IMPROPER VENUE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEJO LUGO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAROLINA S RAMIREZ FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0891 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0890 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less