This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 06:20:07 (UTC).

IZABELLA LOWTRIP -V- COUNTRY INN & SUITES

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 IZABELLA LOWTRIP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTRY INN SUITES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1850

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

IZABELLA LOWTRIP

Defendants and Respondents

PRAKASH BHAKTA

CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC

CARLSON HOTLES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

CARLSON HOTELS, INC

CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY INC

COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY CARLSON

MOTEL 6

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

GIBSON & HUGHES

1551 Tustin Avenue Suite 530

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GOSHGARIAN & MARSHALL

23901 Calabasas Road #2073

Calabasas, CA 91302

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. PAY $100 TO APPEALS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • SUBPOENAS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 02/28/14 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 02/26/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 02/26/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • APPEAL IS DISMISSED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP.; DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP ORDERED SET ASIDE.; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP ORDERED ENTERED 07/02/13; JUDGMENT FOR: CAMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, INC; AND AGAINST IZABELLA LOWTRIP; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $75,406.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $75,406.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DCA ORDER RE: APPEAL IS DISMISSED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED AND FORWARDED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP FOR PRAKASH BHAKTA, ADD MOTEL 6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP, MOTEL 6 IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP, PRAKASH BHAKTA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/18/2011 OF IZABELLA LOWTRIP FOR PRAKASH BHAKTA, ADD COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY CARLSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110218-0578 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.