This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 10:49:36 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS -V- DON GRANTHAM

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DON GRANTHAM. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4528

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC.

Defendant

DON GRANTHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OFJEFFERY FLETTERICK

4354 Town Center Blvd Suite 114 #106

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT / WRIT OF EXECUTION - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,163.24)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 38250.72 ); Minutes; Receipt: 111018-3671 $25.00; 111018-3671-CK Reference Number 51006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110714-3743 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • CASE SENT TO JUDGMENT SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2011
  • DECLARATION OF JEFFREY FLETTERICK WAIVING EXCESS ATTORNEYS FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO EVOLVE MEDIA INC IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): EVOLVE MEDIA INC IS NOT LISTED AS A DEFT ON THE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DON GRANTHAM SERVED ON 05/09/11 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2910 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less