This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:09:40 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS CARLINI

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLINI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2302

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C

Defendants

KATHYRINE MARIA CARLINI, MUARIZIO CARLINI

KATHYRINE MARIA CARLINI

MAURIZIO CARLINI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

2601 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90007

Defendant Attorney

WINET, PATRICK, GAYER, CREIGHTON & HANES

701 B Street Suite 1275

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0069164261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KATHYRINE MARIA CARLINI FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180524-0264 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAURA COHEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C.; ATTORNEY SARAH Y SORENSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:31; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES ARE ATTEMPTING TO RESOLVE THIS MATTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0851 $380.00; 170208-0851-CK Reference Number 0003953778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 02/06/2017 OF INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE C, MAURIZIO CARLINI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PARTY KATHYRINE MARIA CARLINI UPDATED: DEFENDANT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.