This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:06:17 (UTC).

INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2300

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

JULIO PEREZ

ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING & GREEN APC

3435 Overland Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Defendant Attorney

ABELTIN & MIGOYA, LLP

250 N. Golden Circle Drive Suite 115

Santa Ana, CA 92705-4023

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUSAN H GREEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; ATTORNEY JAMES B ABELTIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ, JULIO PEREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:50; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH SIDES.; REASON: PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN COURT MEDIATION.; CASE REFERRED TO COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION; HEARINGS ARE SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/09/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPT. S34; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:51; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUSAN GREEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; ATTORNEY MARCY PETTITT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ, JULIO PEREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; COUNSEL INDICATES SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS ARE TO MOVE FORWARD. COUNSEL REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE; FOR PARTIES TO ATTEMPT TO SETTLE THIS MATTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; 08:59; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUSAN GREEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; ATTORNEY JAMES ABELTIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ, JULIO PEREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:07; THE COURT IS ADVISED THE PARTIES ARE ATTEMPTING TO RESOLVE THIS MATTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/09/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:09; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DEFENDANT ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ, JULIO PEREZ FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALEXIS YVONNE PEREZ, JULIO PEREZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170418-0678 $480.00; 170418-0678-CK Reference Number #3550810

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0516 $240.00; 170208-0516-CK Reference Number 11633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CORRECTED HEARING DATES SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT THE OSC RE: STATUS OF SERVICE AND OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT HAVE BEEN; VACATED AS THEY WERE CALENDARED IN ERROR. A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HEARING HAS BEEN SET ON; 8/7/17 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.