This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:31:53 (UTC).

INSURANCE CO. OF THE WEST VS BAUSMAN & CO.,ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 INSURANCE CO OF THE WEST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAUSMAN CO . This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2143

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA

Defendants

BAUSMAN & COMPANY INC., A CALIFORNIA

BC INVESTMENTS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASCOU HOPKINS LLP

9696 Culver Boulevard Suite 302

Culver City, CA 90232

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • REPLY TO OSC RE STATUS TO MOTION RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/21/18 FILED BY INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 02/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BAUSMAN & COMPANY INC., A CALIFORNIA, BC INVESTMENTS LLC,A LIMITED LIABILITY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $96,548.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $816.15 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $97,364.15; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • CASE SUMMARY IN FURTHER SUPPORT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PKT BY MAIL ON 01/22/18 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON BAUSMAN & COMPANY INC., A CALIFORNIA, BC INVESTMENTS LLC,A LIMITED LIABILITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DECLARATION OF KIM GRANFORS ISO APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE OSC RE:STATUS OF DEF JUDGMNT HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 02/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S22 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST,A CALIFORNIA FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0818 $435.00; 170206-0818-CK Reference Number 7615

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; SUMMONS IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: SECOND DEFENDANT AND DOES; LISTED ON THE COMPLAINT ARE NOT INCLUDED. SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT MUST MATCH EXACTLY.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.