This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 09:09:26 (UTC).

INLAND VS SALCIDO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 INLAND filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALCIDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5402

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO

Defendant

TINA SALCIDO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAN, KENNY KEAN

640 N Diamond Bar Blvd

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0169 $25.00; 171025-0169-CK Reference Number 4511

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/17/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/17/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TINA SALCIDO SERVED ON 08/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TINA SALCIDO SERVED ON 08/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0843 $255.00; 170801-0843-MC Reference Number 031-0031886545

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0169 $25.00; 171025-0169-CK Reference Number 4511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ** VOID ** REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING AB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TINA SALCIDO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • 1169/DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCF.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROOFS/DEFAULT BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TINA SALCIDO FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170807-0291 $2.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0855 $10.50; 170801-0855-MC Reference Number 031-0031886545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY INLAND EMPIRE INVESTMENTFUND, LLC, A CALIFO FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0852 $22.00; 170801-0852-MC Reference Number 031-0031886545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $32.05.--BEGINNING ON 07/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0843 $255.00; 170801-0843-MC Reference Number 031-0031886545

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF