This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/01/2018 at 07:04:19 (UTC).

ING BANK -V- MACQUARIE MORTGAGES USA

Case Summary

On 07/02/2010 ING BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MACQUARIE MORTGAGES USA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7308

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ING BANK FSB

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JANNETTE M BUERBA

GROVER ESCROW CORPORATION

MACQUARIE MORTGAGES USA INC

JOSE L BUERBA JR

ORANGE COAST TITLECOMPANY

ORANGE COAST TITLECOMPANY OF SOUTHERN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GROVER ESCROW CORPORATION

MACQUARIE MORTGAGES USA INC

MACQUARIE MORTGAGES USA , INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILTNER, POLK & MENCK, APC

402 West Broadway, Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS & DAVIS, LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 960

Los Angeles, CA 90067

K&L GATES LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

GREEN & HALL

1851 East First St 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2012
  • 0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY ING BANK FSB.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSALS FILED BY ING BANK FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/22/2011 OF GROVER ESCROW CORPORATION FILED BY GROVER ESCROW CORPORATION, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF GROVER ESCROW CORPORATION, ON 10/09/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA , INC. FILED BY MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA , INC., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA , INC., ON 10/09/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • 0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY ING BANK FSB.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY S OFFICE (LISA) VIA TELEPHONE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS PARTIES ARE CLOSE TO SETTLEMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/05/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • 0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY ING BANK FSB.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER HEATHER PFUTZENREUTER 10294; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY VIA TELEPHONE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/21/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HRG ON OSC RE:DISMISSAL FILED BY ING BANK FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • 0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY ING BANK FSB.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MILTNER,POLK & MENCK APC (VALARIE) VIA TELECOM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2010
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JOSE L BUERBA JR, JANNETTE M BUERBA, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2010 OF MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA INC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/02/2010 OF ING BANK FSB BY MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY K&L GATES LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 100816-4097 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO MACQUARIE MORTGAGESUSA INC. PARTY SERVED ON 07/09/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $114.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY ING BANK FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/02/2010 OF ING BANK FSB - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100702-4875 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less