This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/12/2018 at 19:47:34 (UTC).

INFINITE-V-SALON

Case Summary

On 08/16/2011 INFINITE-V-SALON was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0623

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITE VISION GROUP INC

Defendant

SALON FAVORITE INC

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF INFINITE VISION GROUP INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF INFINITE VISION GROUP INC FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SALON FAVORITE INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SALON FAVORITE INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110822-3211 $50.00; 110822-3211-CK Reference Number 1337

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2012
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM SALON FAVORITE INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/17/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF INFINITE VISION GROUP INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; INFINITE VISION GROUP INC REPRESENTED BY ASHUR MOOSHIABAD.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SALON FAVORITE INC; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; SALON FAVORITE INC NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 10:36; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ASHUR MOOSHIABAD IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SALON FAVORITE INC.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT INFINITE VISION GROUP INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM SALON FAVORITE INC:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $90.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,090.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SALON FAVORITE INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/29/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110822-3211 $50.00; 110822-3211-CK Reference Number 1337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.