This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:41:23 (UTC).

IN THE MTR OF SKODA TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 IN THE MTR OF SKODA TRUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1253

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUDITH GRZESEK

Other

SKODA TRUST DATED APRIL 18, 1994

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DELILAH KNOX RIOS

414 S. Prospectors Rd Ste G

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/06/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/06/17 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/11/2017 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/11/2017 FILED.

HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION RE: ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED.

ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED

ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED

HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0140 $26.00; 170606-0140-VS Reference Number 031-0017795374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DELILAH RIOS PRESENT FOR JUDITH GRZESEK, PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 12/20/2016 OF JUDITH GRZESEK IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 12/20/2016 OF JUDITH GRZESEK ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/06/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DELILAH KNOX RIOS PRESENT FOR JUDITH GRZESEK.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT NOTES THAT ONLY SERVICE NEEDED TO BE COMPLETED IS ON GARY AND BEVERLY SKODA; THE; OTHER PARTIES PREVIOUSLY PERSONALLY SERVED CAN BE NOTICED BY MAIL OF THE NEXT HEARING DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/11/2017 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; JUDITH GRZESEK PRESENT.; ATTORNEY DELILAH KNOW RIOS PRESENT FOR JUDITH GRZESEK.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: ADDITIONAL TIME NEEDED FOR PERSONAL SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON /TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDANTS TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: ORDER TO CONVEY REAL PROPERTY TO DECEDENTS TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL); Minutes; Receipt: 161220-0254 $465.00; 161220-0254-CK Reference Number 606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S35P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.