Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:09:59 (UTC).

In the matter of Troy K. Neste

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 In the matter of Troy K Neste was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0012

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TROY KENNETH NESTE

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRAWFORD, JAMES M

528 North Glassell

Orange, CA 92867

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR RECEIVED FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED PLACED IN FILE

REMITTITUR RECEIVED FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL RECEIVED APPELLANT GRANTED 30 DAYS TO FILE SUP BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL RECEIVED APPELLANT GRANTED 30 DAYS TO FILE SUP BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR RECEIVED FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL RECEIVED APPELLANT GRANTED 30 DAYS TO FILE SUP BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • ATTORNEY FEE CLAIM RECEIVED FROM JAMES M. CRAWFORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • HEARING RE: CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; COURT REPORTER KERRI DAVERSA 13882; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA GRACE PARSONS PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JAMES CRAWFORD PRESENT FOR PETITIONER.; PETITIONER'S APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR THIS HEARING; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 02/11/2016 OF TROY NESTE IS GRANTED; SENTENCE AMENDED IN CASE NUMBER FMB03378.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; RESPONDENT IS ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE RELIEF SOUGHT SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED WITH REGARD; TO PETITIONERS CLAIM.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 02/11/2016 OF TROY NESTE, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; COUNSEL JAMES M CRAWFORD APPOINTED TO REPRESENT TROY KENNETH NESTE; RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO SERVE AND FILE A RETURN ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THIS; ORDER. PETITIONER MAY SERVE AND FILE A TRAVERSE ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE; RETURN.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/11/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S21.; PETITIONER'S APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR THIS HEARING; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES/ORDER/PETITION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO TROY KENNETH NESTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, JAMES M