This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:17:59 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF TOMMY LEE WALTERS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2010 IN THE MATTER OF TOMMY LEE WALTERS was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0360

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOMMY LEE WALTERS

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSSMAN, MARC E

818 N Mountain Avenue Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketP & AS & CORRECTED EXHIBITS H & L GIVEN TO CRIM DEPT--CINDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: INFORMAL HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DWIGHT W MOORE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MARC GROSSMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY RICK YOUNG PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS.; PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 09/14/2010 OF TOMMY WALTERS IS GRANTED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: AFTER HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: INFORMAL HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DWIGHT W MOORE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MARC GROSSMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY APPELLATE SERVICES UNIT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; INFORMAL DISCUSSION HELD IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/23/11 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT F5.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: TRANSFER OF CASE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: JILL MERENDINO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE D MOORE IN DEPARTMENT F5 FOR ALL PURPOSES.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketPETITIONERS REPLY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: JILL MERENDINO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITIONERS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION; OF TIME TO FILE REPLY GRANTED. PETITIONER TO FILE REPLY BY 05/22/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • DocketPETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE REPLY GRANTS SAID REQUEST. PETITIONER TO REPLY BY 5/8/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketPETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • DocketRESPONDENTS INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; SUBMIT INFORMAL RESPONSE GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY 1/21/11;; PETITIONER MAY REPLY BY 2/7/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT MAY FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY 11/19/10; PETITIONER MAY; REPLY BY 12/6/10.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 09/14/2010 OF TOMMY WALTERS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 10/20/10 , A LETTER RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN FIFTEEN,; 11/4/10, DAYS AFTER ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE; COURT IS TO BE SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF FILED; WITH THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketCORRECTED EXHIBITS H AND L - FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO TOMMY LEE WALTERS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN MARC ELLIOT