This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 15:22:47 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF LARESE WHITE

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF LARESE WHITE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0279

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARL WILLIS WHITE

CHERYL WHITE MCGHEE

ROSE ELLA MCDANIEL

KENNETH WHITE

ELLA FAYE WARE

TINRKE LACY

LINSON WHITE

SHIRLEY RATCLIFFE

ARVIS LORETTA BIGGARS

MAE ALICE WALKER

QUEEN BRINSON

KECIA MAYS

LONNIE B WHITE JR

LOLA MAE FIELDS

JOHNETTA BOYD

PAULINE HAMILTON

JASMINE ANDRE WHITE

JAMES WHITE

TAIGAN WILLIAMS

Decedent

LARESE WHITE

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAULINE HAMILTON FOR CC OF ORDR; Minutes; Receipt: 170707-0774 $26.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAULINE HAMILTON FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 170607-0182 $26.50; 170607-0182-CK Reference Number 1902

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT KRASNEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 03/28/2017 OF PAULINE HAMILTON IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 03/28/2017 OF PAULINE HAMILTON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • HRG OF 06/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON (NEW) DETERMINING SUCCESSTION TO REAL PROPERYT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAULINE HAMILTON FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 170328-0186 $465.00; 170328-0186-CK Reference Number 1887

    Read MoreRead Less