Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:32:12 (UTC).

In the matter of Suzette McClure

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 In the matter of Suzette McClure was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0070

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUZETTE MCCLURE

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

, MARC ERIC NO RTON

Po Box 162

Zamora, CA 95698

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

600 W. Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COPY OF AMENDED PETITION SUBMITTED; Minutes; TO COURT OF APPEAL REVIEWED BY THE COURT AND PLACED IN THE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER DATED 11/2/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUAL TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN ORDER TO; HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE; BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 11/28/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • PETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • INFORMAL RESPONSE RECD FROM DOJ. FORWARDED PAPERWORK TO S20 FOR REVIEW FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 08/08/16. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 07/08/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 05/17/2016 OF SUZETTE MCCLURE, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND REQUEST TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND REQUEST TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO SUZETTE MCCLURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less