This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 07:32:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF STANLEY B. THOMAS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2011 IN THE MATTER OF STANLEY B THOMAS was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0239

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STANLEY B THOMAS

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLMS, STEPHAN J

8303 Haven Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL

300 S Spring St, 5Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION REACHED BY THE PARTIES IN THIS ACTION, THE COURT GRANTS THE PETITION FOR; WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (SEE ATTACHED STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SPECIFICS); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • DocketHEARING RE: FURTHER ORDER ON STAY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH RAMIREZ; NOT REPORTED; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING HELD AN INFORMAL CONFERENCE ON MARCH 6, 2015, REGARDING PENAL CODE SECTION; 3003.5 SUBDIVISION (B), THE RECENTLY DECIDED CASE IN RE TAYLOR (2015) CAL. LEXIS 1214, AND; THE PENDING FEDERAL CASE, MICHAEL LEE BREWER, CASE NUMBER EDCV 12-00781 MWF (JCG), FINDS GOOD; CAUSE TO EXTEND THE PREVIOUSLY GRANTED STAY FOR AN ADDITIONAL 180 DAYS TO SEPTEMBER 1, 2015.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRISEIDA RAMIREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION ERS AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS; CORPUS FILED 04/18/2012 AND HAVING PREVIOUSLY HELD AN INFORMAL CONFERENCE REGARDING; PC3003.5(B) IN LEAD CASE WHCSS1000285, ORDERS THE MATTER STAYED PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED; ORDER, PENDING FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE AND COPY OF ORDER DATED 01/13/12 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRISEIDA RAMIREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GENERAL PHILLIP LINDSAY PRESENT.; DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL AMY ROEBUCK PRESENT.; DEPUTY PUBLIC DEFENDER STEPHAN WILLMS PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JAMES CRAWFORD PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; THE COURT HAVING HELD AN INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING PC3003.5(B) IN LEAD CASE; WHCSS1000285 FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND 45-DAY STAY PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED ORDER, PENDING; FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: VACATED; Minutes; VACATE HRG HEARING ON 12/01/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRISEIDA RAMIREZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDERS STAY PREVIOUSLY; IMPOSED PENDING CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 VACATED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS DECISION IN; CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 SHALL BE THE ORDER IN THIS CASE AND RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE AND COPY OF ORDER DENYING PETITION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 06/22/2011 OF STANLEY THOMAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketPRO/PER IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR STANLEY B THOMAS, AND STEPHAN J WILLMS IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT ORDERS PD-STEPHAN WILLMS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT THE PETITIONER AND THE ATTORNEY; GENERAL TO REPRESENT THE RESPONDENT. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS MATTER STAYED PENDING; CONFIRMATION OF DECISION IN WHCSS1000285.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO STANLEY B THOMAS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephan Joseph Willms