This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/22/2018 at 14:06:36 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF SEAN LEON SCALES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 IN THE MATTER OF SEAN LEON SCALES was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0329

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEAN LEON SCALES

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO SEAN LEON SCALES.

WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO SEAN LEON SCALES.

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • CASE SENT BACK TO FILE SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR COURT FINDINGS.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER AND MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • HEARING RE: REVIEW; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: ANNA VELASQUEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/17/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S20W.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO SEAN LEON SCALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20 JUDGE TAVILL

    Read MoreRead Less