Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:37:24 (UTC).

In The Matter of Ronald Barnett Sartain

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 In The Matter of Ronald Barnett Sartain was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0094

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RONALD BARNETT SARTAIN

Respondent

THE STATE OFCALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KENNEDY, MICHAEL J

82632-B Hwy. 111 Ste 3

Indio, CA 92201

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/12/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER DATED 12/12/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY LUANN GEESINK; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: PETITION DENIED ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 12/13/16 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • HEARING RE: SECOND REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE WAS SERVED ON 7/13/16 WITH A REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE AND; HAS FAILED TO PROVIDE THE REQUESTED DOCUMENT. THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY HAS UNTIL 11/21/16 TO FILE AND; SERVE AN INFORMAL RESPONSE. NO EXTENSION OF TIME WILL BE GIVEN, ABSENT EXTRAORDINARY; CIRCUMSTANCES.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • RETURN MAIL: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE RECEIVED BACK FROM RETURNED UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 06/09/2016 OF RONALD SARTAIN, THE STATE OFCALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 08/03/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER ITS; RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; COUNSEL MICHAEL J KENNEDY APPOINTED TO REPRESENT RONALD BARNETT SARTAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • MEMO SUPPORTING HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO RONALD BARNETT SARTAIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less