This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:42:42 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ROGER GIBBS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2010 IN THE MATTER OF ROGER GIBBS was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0400

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROGER GIBBS

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLMS, STEPHAN J

8303 Haven Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2011
  • DocketMISC CORRESPONDENCE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED PETITIONERS MOTION TO COMPET FOR DETERMINATION OF MATTERS; DEEMS IT TO BE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENIES SAID MOTION. ORDER DATED 1/19/11 TO; REMAIN IN EFFECT.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPET FOR DETERMINATION OF MATTERS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ANNE YOUNG; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, INFORMAL RESPONSE AND; REPLY THRERTO RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketRESPONDENTS INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME GRANS; SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL REPSONSE BY 1/10/11; PETITIONER MAY REPLY BY; 1/25/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING INFORMALLY CONFERRED WITH DPD S WILLMS AND DDA G MERRITT APPOINTS COUNSEL FOR; BOTH PARTIES.; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 11/30/10 , A LETTER RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN FIFTEEN,; 12/14/10, DAYS AFTER ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT; IS TO BE SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF FILED WITH THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 10/21/2010 OF ROGER GIBBS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketPRO/PER IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR ROGER GIBBS, AND STEPHAN J WILLMS IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO ROGER GIBBS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephan Joseph Willms