Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:38:27 (UTC).

In The Matter of Robert James Boyd

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 In The Matter of Robert James Boyd was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0098

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT JAMES BOYD

Respondent

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

, RUSSELL A RO BINSON

345 Grove Street 1St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

COURT OF APPEAL ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

COURT OF APPEAL ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT OF APPEAL ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON-APPEARANCE REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA DEVINCE; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRUCE KRELL (VIA SPEAKERPHONE) PRESENT FOR ROBERT BOYD.; ATTORNEY JAMES SECORD, DDA PRESENT FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; COFERENCE HELD IN CHAMBERS.; BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES, THE INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED BY THE DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE; WILL BE TREATED AS A RETURN TO THE PETITION. PETITIONER TO BE ALLOWED UNTIL MARCH 30, 2017 TO; FILE A TRAVERSE.; COURT TO RULE NO LATER THAN APRIL 28, 2017. THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE COURTS; TIME FOR DECISION UNTIL THIS DATE. AT THAT TIME, THE COURT WILL EITHER DECIDE THE CASE ON; THE MERITS, SET THE MATTER FOR ORAL ARGUMENT, OR SET THIS MATTER FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/24/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • HEARING RE: PEOPLES REQUEST FOR TIME TO FILE RETURN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED THE PEOPLES APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TIME TO; FILE A RETURN AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE AND GRANTS SAID REQUEST. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THE; PEOPLES RESPONSE DUE ON MARCH 15,2017. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS A STATUS CONFERENCE SET ON 2/24/17; AT 1:30PM.; HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/24/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S20.; COUNSEL MAY APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY.; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE GREGORY S. TAVILL FOR ALL PURPOSES.; CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S20; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • APP FOR ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TIME FOR PEOPLE TO FILE A RETURN/SET STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; RESPONDENT IS ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE RELIEFSOUGHT SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. RESPONDENT; IS DIRECTED TO SERVE AND FILE A RETURN ON OR BEFORE 01/31/17. PETITIONER MAY SERVE AND FILE A; TRAVERSE ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE RETURN.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER DATED 12/08/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUALLY HEAVY TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN; ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO; EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 12/13/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 08/19/2016. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR EXTESION OF TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 06/09/2016 OF ROBERT BOYD, THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 08/11/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER ITS; RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO ROBERT JAMES BOYD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less