This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/22/2018 at 12:55:07 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ROBERT DOUGLAS RHODES

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 IN THE MATTER OF ROBERT DOUGLAS RHODES was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0053

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT DOUGLAS RHODES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL (COPY OF 4/6/17 MINUTE ORDER & ORDER MAILED TO PETITIONER AT UPDATED ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PARTY ROBERT DOUGLAS RHODES UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO ROBERT DOUGLAS RHODES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20 JUDGE TAVILL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.