This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 08:43:40 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF MICHAEL ETCHINSON

Case Summary

On 05/25/2010 IN THE MATTER OF MICHAEL ETCHINSON was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0173

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL ETCHINSON

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KILDUFF, ANGELO, KILDAY &

601 Universite Ave. Ste. 150

Sascramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketCOPY OF PETITION AND ORDER DENYING PETITION MAILED TO AG OFFICE LA ATTN K FORTHMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ANNEMARIE G PACE PRESIDING.; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, RESPONDENTS INFORMAL; RESPONSE AND REPLY THERETO RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ORDER DENYING WRIT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS REPLY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE PRESIDING.; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT REASSIGNS MATTER TO JUDGE A. PACE FOR ALL FURTHER PURPOSES.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketATTORNEY GENERAL IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AND ANGELO, KILDAY & KILDUFF IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE PRESIDING.; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE; INFORMAL RESPONSE GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY 7/17/10;; PETITIONER MAY REPLY BY 8/3/10.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketCOPIES SENT TO ATTY GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE PRESIDING.; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT REQUESTS RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY 6/17/10; PETITIONER MAY REPLY BY; 7/2/10.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 05/25/2010 OF MICHAEL ETCHINSON, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO MICHAEL ETCHINSON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less