This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 18:41:10 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF LAWRENCE ROJAS

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 IN THE MATTER OF LAWRENCE ROJAS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAWRENCE PHILLIP ROJAS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RANCHO CUCAMONGA

8303 N Haven Avenue 4Th Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF REHABILITATION AND PARDON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO GOVS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE IN PERSON (DA) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION OF CERT OF REHAB FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFELONY PETITION INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.