Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:10:41 (UTC).

In the matter of Lawrence Jamaal McGirt

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 In the matter of Lawrence Jamaal McGirt was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAWRENCE JAMAAL MCGIRT

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURTZ, DARCIA A

827 Matagual Dr

Vista, CA 92081

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DENYING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY VIZCARRA; COURT REPORTER DAWN JORDAN 12873; BAILIFF: R. BEARDSLEE; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA MARK VOS PRESENT.; ATTORNEY DACIA A. BURZ PRESENT FOR PETITIONER LAWRENCE JAMAAL MCGIRT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD OFF THE RECORD.; COURT HAD PREVIOUSLY FOUND GOOD CAUSE TO GRANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ISSUE A RULING TO; 02/24/2017.; COURT FINDS DISCUSSIONS ONGOING. ON 02/23/2017 IF COUNSEL HAS NOT NOTIFIED THE COURT THAT AN; AGREEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED, THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND TIME TO RULE ON THE PETITION FOR; WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS TO 03/03/2017.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, THIS MATTER IS SET FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE ON 02/17/17 AT 8:30 AM IN; DEPT R2 RANCHO CUCAMONGA.; COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO GRANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ISSUE A RULING.; THE COURT HEREBY EXTENDS ITS TIME TO RULE ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS TO 02/24/17.; HEARINGS:; STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR 02/17/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R2.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/25/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 02/17/20 ====; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY MARY VIZCARRA; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: ADD COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE ==

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT AND IN ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW,; THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING; 01/27/17.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S20.; PETITIONER'S APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR THIS HEARING; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • REPLY AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PEOPLES RETURN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • PEOPLES MOTION TO SET ASIDE OSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • PEOPLES REQ FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 06/22/2016. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • PEOPLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • TO S20 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; RESPONDENT IS ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE RELIEF SOUGHT SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED WITH REGARD; TO PETITIONERS CLAIM. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO SERVE AND FILE A RETURN ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS; AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PETITIONER MAY SERVE AND FILE A TRAVERSE ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS; AFTER THE FILING OF THE RETURN.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 02/23/2016 OF LAWRENCE MCGIRT, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO LAWRENCE JAMAAL MCGIRT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less