This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:57:51 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF LARRY JAMES MEYER

Case Summary

On 10/26/2010 IN THE MATTER OF LARRY JAMES MEYER was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0412

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARRY JAMES MEYER

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRAWFORD, JAMES M

528 North Glassell

Orange, CA 92867

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL

300 S Spring St, 5Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketCLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S20 FOR SIGNATURE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY FEE CLAIM RECEIVED FROM JAMES CRAWFORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketHEARING RE: CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL PHILLIP J. LINDSAY (VIA TELEPHONE) PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JAMES M. CRAWFORD PRESENT FOR PETITIONER.; PETITIONER'S APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR THIS HEARING; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: TO DISPO HEARING; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketHEARING RE: CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL PHILLIP J. LINDSAY PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JAMES M. CRAWFORD PRESENT FOR PETITIONER.; PETITIONER'S APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR THIS HEARING; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: TO DISPO HEARING; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: STAY ORDER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING REFERRED THE MATTER TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR AN INFORMAL RESPONSE AND; THE PUBLIC DEFENDER FOR A REPLY, VACATES PREVIOUS ORDER. THE COURT HAVING HELD AN; INFORMAL CONFERENCE REGARDING PC3003.5(B) IN LEAD CASE WHCSS1000285 FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO; EXTEND 45 DAY STAY PREVIOUSLY GRANTED PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED ORDER, PENDING FURTHER ORDER; FROM THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • DocketRESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 02/14/2012; PETITIONER TO FILE REPLY BY 02/29/2012.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketPETITIONERS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT ORDERS MATTER REFERRED TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR AN INFORMAL RESPONSE ON THE ISSUE; ONLY OF PC3003.5(B) "AS APPLIED". RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY 01/09/2012; PETITIONER; TO FILE REPLY BY 01/24/2012.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDERS STAY PREVIOUSLY; IMPOSED PENDING CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 VACATED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS DECISION IN; CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 SHALL BE THE ORDER IN THIS CASE AND RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISCOVERY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 10/26/2010 OF LARRY MEYER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketPRO/PER IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR LARRY JAMES MEYER, AND JAMES M CRAWFORD IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING RECIEVED THE REQUESTED INFORMATION APPOINTS JAMES CRAWFORD TO REPRESENT; PETITIONER AND THE ATTORNEY GENERAL TO REPRESENT RESPONDENT.; THE COURT ORDERED RESPONDENT TO FILE RETURN BY 3/2/11; PETITIONER TO FILE TRAVERSE BY 4/1/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: CORRECTION OF MINUTES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; IT COMING TO THE COURTS ATTENTION THAT AN ERROR WAS MADE IN THE 10/28/10 MINUTES THE COURT; ORDERS THE MINUTES CORRECTED TO SHOW THE PETITION IS STILL OPEN AND ACTIVE AND THE; PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO SUPPLY SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION WITHIN 30 DAYS FOR FURTHER ACTION TO; BE TAKEN BY THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN ORDER RE-SENT THIS DATE FOR DTAILS.; SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABAES CORPUS FILED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketADDITIONAL PAGES FOR PETITION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ORDER DENYING WRIT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE; ITEMS DELETED TO REOPEN CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO LARRY JAMES MEYER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, JAMES M