Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:54:46 (UTC).

In The Matter of Kevin G. McGraw

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 In The Matter of Kevin G McGraw was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0126

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEVIN G. MCGRAW

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE INFORMAL REPONSE FILED.

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE INFORMAL REPONSE FILED.

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONERS REQUEST IS DENIED. THE PETITION HAS ALREADY BEEN DECIDED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • FWD MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO LEGAL RESEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE INFORMAL REPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR COURT FINDINGS.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER/COURT ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • INFORMAL RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • CORPUS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; AFTER REVIEW OF THE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION, THE COURT GRANTS THE REQUEST IN PART. TIME TO FILE; THE INFORMAL RESPONSE IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 12, 2018.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • ORDER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • FWD REQ FOR EXT FROM DA TO LEGAL RESEARCH FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • HEARING RE: RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE; INFORMAL RESPONSE, THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO GRANT SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL; RESPONSE BY 06/30/2017. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND TIME FOR RULING TO 08/14/17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/15/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY LUANN GEESINK; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: GOOD CAUSE FINDING ADDED ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 02/22/15 ====; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 02/15/17 CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • PEOPLES REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • ORDER FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DWIGHT W MOORE, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 02/13/17, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 07/19/2016 OF KEVIN MCGRAW, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • ORDER STAYING ACTION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • HEARING RE: ORD STAYING ACTION ON PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPU; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT ORDERS ACTION ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS STAYED PENDING RULING ON AN; ISSUE THAT CURRENTLY PENDING BEFORE THE CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT. THE MATTER IS STAYED; PENDING THE RULING ON THE CASES OR FOR 120 DAYS, WHICHEVER FIRST OCCURS.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN ORDER FOR DETAILS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO KEVIN G. MCGRAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED; Minutes; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL LETTER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less