Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:14:38 (UTC).

In the matter of Juvenal Ruiz

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 In the matter of Juvenal Ruiz was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUVENAL RUIZ

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

600 W. Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER DATED 11/3/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PARTY JUVENAL RUIZ UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PARTY JUVENAL RUIZ UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUALLY HEAVY TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN; ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO; EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 11/30/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • HEARING RE: EXTENSION OF TIME LIMITATIONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT AND IN ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW,; THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING; 09/30/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • REPLY TO REPONDENTS INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • RESPONDENTS INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 07/05/2016. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • PLACED RESPONDENT EXPARTE APP IN S20S BIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • BY THE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • FOWARDED RESPONDENTS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 06/03/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 03/11/2016 OF JUVENAL RUIZ, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND REQUEST TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO JUVENAL RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less