Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:44:14 (UTC).

In the matter of John Atlas

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 In the matter of John Atlas was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0118

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHN ATLAS JR.

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDAR

321 East 2Nd. Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4202

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER MODIFIED DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

ORDER MODIFIED DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • DEFT INQUIRING ABOUT STATUS OF WRIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • FORWARDED COPY OF DENIAL ORDER TO DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MODIFIED ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER MODIFIED DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITIONERS VERIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF WHC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • INFORMAL RESPONSE FROM THE OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 11/18/2016, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 30 DAYS AFTER ITS; RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT..; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 07/14/2016 OF JOHN ATLAS JR., STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND REQUEST TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUAL TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN ORDER TO; HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE; BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 11/30/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO JOHN ATLAS JR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less