Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:43:41 (UTC).

In the matter of Jesse Gomez

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 In the matter of Jesse Gomez was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0116

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JESSE GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL STATING THAT THE PETITI ON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED. PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL STATING THAT THE PETITI ON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED. PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL STATING THAT THE PETITI ON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED. PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • AT PETITIONERS REQUEST PER CORRESPONDENCE FILED 5/12/17: COPY OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION AND DENIAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • PARTY JESSE GOMEZ UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PETITIONERS CORRESPONDENCE DATED 02/16/17; Minutes; PLACED IN FILE. NO ACTION IS TAKEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/01/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED PETITIONERS WRITTEN REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT COUNSEL; TO REPRESENT HIM. PETITIONERS REQUEST IS HEREBY DENIED AS HE DOES NOT MEET THE REQUIREMENTS FOR; APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY LUANN GEESINK; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: PART OF SECOND SENTENCE REMOVED ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 12/12/16 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • PETITIONERS WRITTEN REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND DECLARATION OF INDIGENCY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PARTY JESSE GOMEZ UPDATED: ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUAL TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN ORDER TO; HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE; BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 10/26/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO JESSE GOMEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less