This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 06:25:26 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF JERRY MANUEL MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 05/05/2011 IN THE MATTER OF JERRY MANUEL MARTINEZ was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0148

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JERRY MANUEL MARTINEZ

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLMS, STEPHAN J

8303 Haven Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL

300 S Spring St, 5Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION REACHED BY THE PARTIES IN THIS ACTION, THE COURT GRANTS THE; PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (SEE ATTACHED STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SPECIFICS); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketHEARING RE: FURTHER ORDER ON STAY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SMITH, JUDGE; CLERK: ANNA VELASQUEZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING HELD AN INFORMAL CONFERENCE ON MARCH 6, 2015, REGARDING PENAL CODE SECTION; 3003.5 SUBDIVISION (B), THE RECENTLY DECIDED CASE IN RE TAYLOR (2015) CAL. LEXIS 1214, AND; THE PENDING FEDERAL CASE, MICHAEL LEE BREWER, CASE NUMBER EDCV 12-00781 MWF (JCG), FINDS GOOD; CAUSE TO EXTEND THE PREVIOUSLY GRANTED STAY FOR AN ADDITIONAL 180 DAYS TO SEPTEMBER 1, 2015.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketPETITIONERS AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HAB EAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSA LEEDHAM; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITIONERS AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF; HABEAS CORPUS FILED 04/2/2012 AND HAVING PREVIOUSLY HELD AN INFORMAL CONFERENCE REGARDNG; PC3003.5(B) IN LEAD CASE WHCSS1000285, ORDERS THE MATTER STAYED PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED; ORDER, PENDING FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketHEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRISEIDA RAMIREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GENERAL PHILLIP LINDSAY PRESENT.; DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL AMY ROEBUCK PRESENT.; DEPUTY PUBLIC DEFENDER STEPHAN WILLMS PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JAMES CRAWFORD PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; THE COURT HAVING HELD AN INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING PC3003.5(B) IN LEAD CASE; WHCSS1000285 FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND 45-DAY STAY PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED ORDER, PENDING; FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT.; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DUKE D ROUSE, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; MINUTES UPDATED BY RAUL RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDERS STAY PREVIOUSLY; IMPOSED PENDING CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 VACATED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS DECISION IN; CASE NUMBER WHCSS1000285 SHALL BE THE ORDER IN THIS CASE AND RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketCAMERON PAGE IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AND ATTORNEY GENERAL IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 05/05/2011 OF JERRY MARTINEZ, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketPRO/PER IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR JERRY MANUEL MARTINEZ, AND STEPHAN J WILLMS IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketHEARING RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT HAS BEEN ADVISED BY PD S WILLMS THAT THE INFRMATION IN THIS PETITION IS CURRENT.; THE COURT ORDERS PD S WILLMS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT PETITIONER AND THE ATTORNEY GENERAL TO; REPRESENT RESPONDENT. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS THIS MATTER STAYED PENDING CONFIRMATION OF; DECISION IN WHCSS100285. SEE FORMAL ORDER FOR DETAILS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; ; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO JERRY MANUEL MARTINEZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephan Joseph Willms