This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:08:53 (UTC).

In the matter of Jacque L. Baskin

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 In the matter of Jacque L Baskin was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0004

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACQUE L BASKIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • CASE SENT BACK TO FILE SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RECEIVED ON; 02/01/2016 FINDS IT TO BE A SERIAL PETITION ALLEGING NEW FACTS AND DENIES SAID PETITION.; ORDER DATED 05/13/2014 IN CASE WHCSS1400097 REMAINS IN EFFECT.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO JACQUE L BASKIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less