Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:11:58 (UTC).

In the matter of Gregory D. Williams

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 In the matter of Gregory D Williams was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0019

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREGORY D. WILLIAMS

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

600 W. Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER & ORDER DATED 11/2/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT, UNUSUALLY HEAVY TRIAL SCHEDULE, COURTS VACATION AND IN; ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO; EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING 11/30/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS INFORMAL RES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED 7/15/16 FILED BY GREGORY D. WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • COPY OF M/O DATED 08/16/2016 RESENT TO DEF/NEW ADD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • PARTY GREGORY D. WILLIAMS UPDATED: CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE A REPLY, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. PETITIONER TO FILE A REPLY BY 8/19/2016.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • RESPONDENTS EX PARTE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 08/04/16. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 02/23/2016 OF GREGORY WILLIAMS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SYLVIA GUTIERREZ; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 07/05/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • HEARING RE: COURTS EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT IS CURRENTLY REVIEWING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. HOWEVER, DUE TO THE PRESS; OF OTHER BUSINESS BEFORE THE COURT AND IN ORDER TO HAVE ADEQUATE TIME TO COMPLETE ITS REVIEW,; THE COURT HEREBY FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH TO ISSUE A RULING TO AND INCLUDING; 06/17/16.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO GREGORY D. WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less