Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/21/2018 at 13:41:20 (UTC).

In the matter of Edward White Jr.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 In the matter of Edward White Jr was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0114

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDWARD WHITE JR.

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

, APPELLATE SE RVICES UNIT

303 W. Third Street 5Th Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92145

 

Court Documents

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY AND; DENIES SAME AS UNTIMELY. PETITION WAS DENIED ON 02/09/17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/16/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA DEVINCE; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FWD PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXT TO LEGAL RESEARCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • RECEIVED PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILE REPLY TO RESPONDENT INFORMAL RESPONSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PEOPLES REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 01/13/2017. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • HEARING RE: PEOPLES REQUEST OF EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE PEOPLES REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED PER RULE 4.551(H). THE RESPONSE IS DUE; ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 23, 2016. ANY REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 5, 2017.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 11/16/16 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 11/18/2016. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • PEOPLES APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 09/27/16, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 07/06/2016 OF EDWARD WHITE JR., STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; THAT PORTION OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IN WHICH PETITIONER ASSERTS THERE WAS; INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT HIS CONVICTION IS DENIED; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO EDWARD WHITE JR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less