Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/05/2017 at 07:49:49 (UTC).

In the matter of Alfred Brooks

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 In the matter of Alfred Brooks was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0363

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALFRED BROOKS

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

600 W. Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL SECOND CORRECTED AND AMENDED ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • SECOND CORRECTED AND AMENDED ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF CORRECTED/AMENDED ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • CORRECTED AND AMENDED ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • PETITIONERS INFORMAL REPLY UNTIMELY (NOT ADDRESSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RULES AS FOLLOWS:; PETITION DENIED; PLEASE SEE WRITTEN RULING FOR ANY FINDINGS; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL); DISPOSITION: BEFORE HEARING (CRIMINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • PEOPLES INFORMAL RESPONSE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; THE COURT HAVING READ AND CONSIDERED RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO; FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE, GRANTS SAID REQUEST. RESPONDENT TO FILE INFORMAL RESPONSE BY; 01/29/2016. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN 15 DAYS THEREAFTER.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPL TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL RESPONSE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KATRINA WEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JANET HINOJOSA; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER HAS FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. RESPONDENT IS DIRECTED TO FILE; AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 12/17/15, AN INFORMAL RESPONSE TO THE CONTENTIONS CONTAINED IN THE; PETITION. PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY TO THIS INFORMAL RESPONSE WITHIN 15 DAYS AFTER; ITS RECEIPT. A COPY OF ANY REPLY OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION FILED WITH THE COURT IS TO BE; SERVED ON COUNSEL FOR THE RESPONDENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF WITH THE COURT.; ON THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (PC 1473) FILED 11/02/2015 OF ALFRED BROOKS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES AND REQUEST TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION ASSIGNED TO S20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED AND NOTICE MAILED TO ALFRED BROOKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • NOTICE PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less