This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:25:19 (UTC).

IN RE:MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 IN RE MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7861

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • OSC RE: NAME CHANGE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:17; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSNCH.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER,; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PARTY MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS UPDATED: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS FOR NEW FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL ANTHONY BILLINGS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S17

    Read MoreRead Less