This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

IN RE:BARBARA JO PELLERIN

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 IN RE BARBARA JO PELLERIN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9383

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARBARA JO PELLERIN

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR RECORDS CHECK FILED BY BARBARA JO PELLERIN

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR RECORDS CHECK FILED BY BARBARA JO PELLERIN

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM BARBARA JO PELLERIN TO ROBERT MARTIN PELLERIN AND GENDER FILED FILED.

DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM BARBARA JO PELLERIN TO ROBERT MARTIN PELLERIN AND GENDER FILED FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM BARBARA JO PELLERIN TO ROBERT MARTIN PELLERIN AND GENDER FILED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • OSC RE: CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BARBARA JO PELLERIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS PROOF OF PUBLICATION IS NOT REQUIRED IN THIS MATTER. PETITIONER PROVIDES SUFFICIENT; DECLARATION/AFFIDAVIT FROM DOCTORS.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; WITNESS -- BARBARA JO PELLERIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED 10/04/2017 OF BARBARA PELLERIN IS GRANTED; DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER IS SIGNED BY THE COURT.; HENCEFORTH THE APPLICANT'S NAME SHALL BE ROBERT MARTIN PELLERIN.; AND GENDER SHALL BE CHANGED FROM FEMALE TO MALE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • FILE RETAINED IN S17 FOR NEXT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • OSC RE: CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BARBARA JO PELLERIN PRESENT; PETITIONERS SISTER KIM ALCANTAR PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES AFFIDAVIT OF DOCTOR PURSUANT TO HEALTH & SAFETY CODE 103430(A) HAS NOT BEEN; PROVIDED TO THE COURT. THE COURT WILL NOT RULE ON THIS MATTER WITHOUT AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE; DOCTOR.; ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, TODAYS HEARING IS CONTINUED TO ALLOW PETITIONER TO OBTAIN; AFFIDAVIT FROM DOCTOR AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT FOR REVIEW. IF THE AFFIDAVIT IS SUBMITTED TO THE; COURT PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THE COURT WILL RULE ON THE MATTER AND THE HEARING WILL BE; VACATED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR RECORDS CHECK FILED BY BARBARA JO PELLERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARBARA JO PELLERIN FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0264 $435.00; 171004-0264-VS Reference Number 396101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S17

    Read MoreRead Less