Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 12:57:36 (UTC).

IN RE: WILLIAM JOE MORGAN

Case Summary

On 09/20/2011 IN RE WILLIAM JOE MORGAN was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1041

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendants

WILLIAM JOE MORGAN

ONE .30 OLIN-MATHIESON CORP/WINCHESTER/WING

ONE .243 CALIBER O.F. MOSSERBG& SONS BOLT

ONE .223 CALIBER COLT SEMI-AUTOMATIC RIFLE,

ONE .22 CALIBER CHIPMUNK BOLT ACTION RIFLE

ONE .45 CALIBER SMITH & WESSONREVOLVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER LLP

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ORDER ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIATL DETERMINATION RE RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • HEARING RE: PETITION RE RETURN OF FIREARMS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J. SCHNEIDER, JUDGE; CLERK: TRENESHA BEAMON; COURT REPORTER ROSIE SAMPLES 12383; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAURA L. CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT WILLIAM JOE MORGAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MEDICAL RECORDS ARE RECEIVED AND REVIEWED BY THE COURT.; WITNESS -- OFFICER MARIA MONTO FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- OFFICER STEVEN REED FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- WILLIAM JOE MORGAN, DEFENDANT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- ROXANNE MORGAN FOR THE DEFENDANT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION TRUE AND THE PETITION IS GRANTED.; OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 09/20/2011 OF FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • MED RECORDS FROM CITY OF FONTANA RETAINED IN DEPT S31 FOR 1/12/12 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • NOTICE OF LODGEMT OF MED RECORDS IN SUPP OF PETITION FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: LESLIE RICHARDSON; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT W DITFURTH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT WILLIAM JOE MORGAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; DEFENDANT WILLIAM JOE MORGAN HAS SIGNED A CONSENT FOR RELEASE OF MEDICAL RECORDS TO PETITIONERS; COUNSEL.; DEFENDANT WAIVES RIGHT TO HEARING WITHIN 30 DAYS.; PETITONERS COUNSEL TO FORWARD MEDICAL RECORDS TO THE COURT UPON RECEIPT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: PETITION RE RETURN OF FIREARMS SET FOR 01/12/12 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR RETURN OF FIREARMS BY MAIL ON 10/21/11 AS TO BEST BEST & KREIGER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM JOE MORGAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • NOTICE OF STATUS HRG ON PTN SEEKING JUDICIAL DETRMNTN FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PTN/DECL BY MAIL ON 09/20/11 AS TO WILLIAM JOE MORGAN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER MARIA MONTO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL RETURN TO FIREARMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant