This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:47:08 (UTC).

IN RE: TRAVIS MCGREGOR

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 IN RE TRAVIS MCGREGOR was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0032

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JARROD BURGUAN

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Respondents

ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN

TRAVIS MCGREGOR

Other

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

290 North "D" St., 3Rd Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Other Attorney

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY DISTRICTATTORNEY

412 W. Hospitality Lane Suite 301

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0023

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • ORDER FILED BY THE CITY ATTORNEY SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR RETURN FIREARM W&I 8102; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: QUIANA DUCKSWORTH; COURT REPORTER SUSAN KEIL 10840; BAILIFF: S KEIGER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STACIA L JOHNS PRESENT FOR THE CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.; TRAVIS MCGREGOR PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT AND COUNSEL HAVE REVIEW MEDICAL RECORDS.; AFTER REVIEWING THE RECORDS; PETITIONER HAS NO OPPOSITION TO RETURNING THE FIREARMS TO THE OWNER TRAVIS MCGREGOR,; ON THE FOLLOWING CONDITION(S): THERE ARE NO CONDITIONS; PETITION DENIED; THE CITY ATTORNEY TO PREPARE ORDER.; ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR SIGNATURE; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL REGARDING COURT DECISION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE ALSO GIVEN TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); DISPOSITION COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RETURNED FROM DEPARTMENT S10 TO EXHIBITS - OPENED AND EXHIBIT RECEIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • SUBP RCVD 082715 IN CONFIDENTIAL FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED ON 082715 SENT TO DEPARTMENT S10 AS REQUESTED BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RETURN OF FIREARMS PURSUANT TO W&I CODE 8102; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: QUIANA DUCKSWORTH; COURT REPORTER SUSAN KEIL 10840; BAILIFF: C KOLB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JARROD BURGUAN PRESENT FOR CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.; TRAVIS MCGREGOR PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES.; COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF SUBPOENA RECORDS. COURT OPENS RECORDS IN COURT. THE COURT PROVIDES THE; RESPONDENT WITH A COPY OF HIS MEDICAL RECORDS. THE CITY ATTORNEY REQUEST TO REVIEW THE RECORDS; IN COURT ON A LATER DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: PETITION FOR RETURN FIREARM W&I 8102 SET FOR 11/17/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S10.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 08/27/15 HRG RE FIREARMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED FROM ST. BERNARDINES MEDICAL CENTER (1 ENVELOPE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • HEARING RE: PETITION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RETURN OF FIREARMS PURSUANT TO W&I CODE 8102; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: QUIANA DUCKSWORTH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: K GALLACHER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON M EWERT PRESENT FOR SAN BERNARDINO CITY ATTORNEY.; RESPONDENT TRAVIS MCGREGOR NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR SAN BENARDINO CITY INDICATES THAT HE HAS SPOKEN TO THE RESPONDENT TRAVIS MCGREGOR AND; THEY BOTH REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/06/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S10.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE CITY ATTORNEY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2015
  • ANSWER FILED BY TRAVIS MCGREGOR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: STEVEN ROTH; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON EWERT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT TRAVIS MCGREGOR PRESENT; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER CONTINUED TO SUBPOENA MEDICAL RECORDS. DEFENDANT STIPULATE TO THE RELEASE OF MEDICAL; RECORDS.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: PETITION SET FOR 08/27/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION FILED AS TO TRAVIS MCGREGOR. PARTY SERVED ON 05/28/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • ON THE OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 05/07/2015 OF JARROD BURGUAN, DISTRICT ATTORNEY IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.