Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 09:41:25 (UTC).

IN RE SUMMER JAMERSON

Case Summary

On 06/03/2011 IN RE SUMMER JAMERSON was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7182

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

SUMMER JAMERSON

Other

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 168048

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Other Attorney

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE-BUREAU OF FIREARMS

P.O. Box 168048

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2012
  • 1 ABSTRACT, 2 CHECKS IOMD TO RECORDERS OFFICE IOM#0022 FROM NORFOLK, VA FOR RECORDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • COURTESY COPY OF CERTIFIED MINUTE ORDER PROVIDED TO PTNR THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • SUBPOENAS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • SUBPOENA RECORDS RETURNED FROM DEPARTMENT S31 TO EXHIBITS - OPENED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • ORDER FOR PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARMS PROHIBITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: TRENESHA BEAMON; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY DIXON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SUMMER JAMERSON; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM FIREARM PROHIBITION.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; DISTRICT ATTORNEY TIMOTHY DIXON IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE TO THE COURT A CRIMINAL BACKGROUND CHECK; ON RESPONDENT SUMMER JAMERSON.; DISTRICT ATTORNEY TIMOTHY DIXON RETURNS TO COURT WITH REQUESTED CRIMINAL BACKGROUND CHECK.; COURT FINDS:; UPON REVIEW OF SUBMITTED DOCUMENTS AND NO OBJECTIONS BY PETITIONER, COURT GRANTS THE; PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM FIREARM PROHIBITION.; PURSUANT TO WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE SECTION; 8103.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED ON 07/25/11 SENT TO DEPARTMENT S31 AS REQUESTED BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • SUBPOENA RECORDS RETURNED FROM DEPARTMENT S31 TO EXHIBITS - OPENED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED ON 07/25/11 SENT TO DEPARTMENT S31 AS REQUESTED BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2011
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED FROM LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY BEHAVIORAL MEDICINE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF PSYCHIATRIC MEDICAL RECORDS (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; COUNSEL FOR DA NOT PRESENT; DEFENDANT SUMMER JAMERSON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM FIREARM PROHIBITION.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE RECORDS OF SUMMER JAMERSON BE ORDERED FROM LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY; BEHAVIOURAL MEDICINE. THE COURT SIGNS THE ORDER RE: PRODUCTION OF PSYCHIATRIC RECORDS WHICH IS; MAILED TO LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY BEHAVIOURAL MEDICINE BY THE CLERK. RECORDS ARE ORDERED TO BE; DELIVERED WITHIN 10 DAYS.; A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE IS TO BE PRESENT AT THE NEXT HEARING DATE; TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SUMMER JAMERSONS REQUEST FOR RELIEF SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/23/11 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO DA AND SUMMER JAMERSON/ TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Minutes; AND DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 06/03/2011 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ATTORNEY DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE-BUREAU OFFIREARMS ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 06/03/2011 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR SUMMER JAMERSON, ATTORNEY PRO/PER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant