This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 14:40:24 (UTC).

IN RE REVOCABLE TRUST OF SAMUEL J SANDERS DATED 03

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 IN RE REVOCABLE TRUST OF SAMUEL J SANDERS DATED 03 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0224

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

ANTHONY SANDERS

TREBIEN BELLOWS

SAMUEL J. SANDERS JR.

ELVIA SANDERS

Other

IN RE REVOCABLE TRUST OF SAMUEL J SANDERS D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

OLDMAN, COOLEY, SALLUS, GOLD, BIRNBERG &COL

16133 Ventura Boulevard Penthouse A

Encino, CA 914362447

GIFFORD, DEARING &ABERNATHY, LLP

515 S. Figueroa St. Ste 2060

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK

215 North D Street Suite 100

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: FOR ORDER 1.DETERMINING THAT CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY IS AN ASSET OF THE REVOCABLE TRUST ETC. FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR ORDER 1.DETERMINING THAT CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY IS AN ASSET OF THE REVOCABLE TRUST ETC. FILED.

PETITION RE: 1.SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE SAMUEL SANDERS, JR:2.REMOV AL OF TRUSTEE; ETC FILED.

PETITION RE: 1.SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE SAMUEL SANDERS, JR:2.REMOV AL OF TRUSTEE; ETC FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR ORDER 1.DETERMINING THAT CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY IS AN ASSET OF THE REVOCABLE TRUST ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • PETITION FOR 1.SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE SAMUEL SANDERS, JR:2.REMOV AL OF TRUSTEE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SAMUEL J. SANDERS JR. AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR ORDER 1.DETERMINING THAT CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY IS AN ASSET OF THE REVOCABLE TRUST ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • PETITION FOR 1.SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE SAMUEL SANDERS, JR:2.REMOV AL OF TRUSTEE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SAMUEL J. SANDERS JR. AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANTHONY SANDERS, TREBIEN BELLOWS FOR OBJECTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180615-0226 $435.00; 180615-0226-CK Reference Number 128866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • OBJECTION TO FIRST ACCOUNT FILED BY ANTHONY SANDERS AND TREBIEN BELLOWS

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • ON THE PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 03/10/2017 OF ANTHONY SANDERS, SAMUEL J. SANDERS JR. IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • OBJECTION TO PTN FOR SUSP OF TRUSTEE, REMOVAL AND SURCHARGE FILED BY SAMUEL J SANDERS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • HRG OF 05/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/17/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/17/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANTHONY SANDERS, TREBIEN BELLOWS FOR PETITION(2); Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0093 $930.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR ORDER 1.DETERMINING THAT CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY IS AN ASSET OF THE REVOCABLE TRUST ETC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: 1.SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE SAMUEL SANDERS, JR:2.REMOV AL OF TRUSTEE; ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less