This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:38:36 (UTC).

IN RE: KIMBERLY J. DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/20/2015 IN RE KIMBERLY J DOMINGUEZ was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0020

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

KIMBERLY JASMINE DOMINGUEZ

Other

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE BUREAU OF FIREARMS ME

P.O. Box 168048

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Other Attorney

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE-BUREAU OF FIREARMS

P.O. Box 168048

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2015
  • HEARING RE: REGARDING HEARING ON 07/23/15; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: QUIANA DUCKSWORTH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; APPEARANCES:; NONAPPEARANCE BY BOTH PARTIES.; APPEARANCES:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON 07/23/15 THE PETTITIONER WAS NOT PRESENT AT THE HEARING AND THE MATTER WAS TAKEN OFF; CALENDAR.; THE PETITIONER WAS NOTIFIED BY THE COURT OF THE HEARING DATED 07/23/15 AND THE PETITIONER FAILED; TO APPEAR FOR THE HEARING.; COURT FINDS THAT THE PETITIONER WAS PROPERLY NOTICED AND THAT THE PETITIONER FAILED TO APPEAR; COURT DENIES PETITIONERS PETITION; COURT DENIES PETITION FOR ORDER TO OWN, POSSESS, CONTROL, RECEIVE AND PURCHASE FIREARMS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); DISPOSITION COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION DENIED; CASE CLOSED.; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY JWEST; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: ENTER DISPO CODES ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 09/02/15 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING DATE 07/21/15 SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SEE ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER REGARDING HEARINGHEARD ON 07/21/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LORENZO RAFAEL BALDERRAMA, JUDGE; CLERK: QUIANA DUCKSWORTH; COURT REPORTER SUSAN KEIL 10840; BAILIFF: K GALLACHER; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA KRISTEN CAINE PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIMBERLY JASMINE DOMINGUEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PETITIONER WAS NOTIFIED OF THE HEARING DATE OF 07/21/15. PETITIONER WAS NOT PRESENT FOR; HEARING.; MATTER TAKEN OFF CALENDAR; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA KRISTEN CAINE IS PRESENT.; PETITIONER KIMBERLY DOMINGUEZ IS PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PETITIONER KIMBERLY DOMINGUEZ IS ENCOURAGED TO CONSULT WITH LEGAL COUNSEL AND IS PROVIDED WITH; BAR ASSOCIATION AND LEGAL AID CONTACT INFORMATION.; PETITIONER REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE TO CONSULT WITH LEGAL COUNSEL.; PARTIES ARE ENCOURAGED TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/21/15 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S10.; TIME WAIVED UNTIL 07/21/15.; PLUS 30 DAYS; CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • MEDICAL RECORDS ARE BEING RETAINED IN THE EXHIBIT CLOSET OF DEPT S25 FOR 5/22/15 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR HRG ON FIREARM PROHIBITION BY MAIL ON 05/04/15 AS TO KIMBERLY JASMINE DOMINGUEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; COURT REPORTER RACHEL PARRA 13566; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA KRISTEN CAINE IS PRESENT.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/22/15 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DDA CAINE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/02/15 AS TO KIMBERLY JASMINE DOMINGUEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; COURT REPORTER KELLY MAGGS 13384; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KRISTEN CAINE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT KIMBERLY JASMINE DOMINGUEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED FOR RECEIPT OF SUBPOENAED RECORDS.; TIME WAIVED UNTIL 06/03/15.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/04/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DDA CAINE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.