Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 16:39:21 (UTC).

IN RE: HENRY SALCIDO GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/28/2011 IN RE HENRY SALCIDO GOMEZ was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2672

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Respondents

HENRY SALCIDO GOMEZ

ONE 9 MM CALIBER GLOCK SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTO

ONE .45 CALIBER GLOCK SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTOL

ONE 12 GAUGE MAVERICK ARMS PUMP ACTION SHOT

Other

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

One Corporate Plaza 3500 Porsche Way Suite 200

Ontario, CA 91764

Other Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED ORDER FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110907-2845 $2.50; 110907-2845-CK Reference Number #58340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • AMENDED ORDER ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERM INATION RE RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN A KEARNS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION OF ALICIA LOPEZ IN SPPT OF REQST TO CORRECT ERROR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN A KEARNS FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • ORDER ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE RETU RNE OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED; Minutes; PLEASE SEE ATTACHED ORDER REGARDING THE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • SUBPOENAS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • HEARING RE: PETN SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERM RE: DEADLY WEAPONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAURA L CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT HENRY SALCIDO GOMEZ PRESENT; ATTORNEY PAUL T THOMSENS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE:DEADLY WEAPONS.; 10:16; TIM MOBERG IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.; 10:26; OFFICER PETER BRESLIN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.; RESPONDENT PRESENTS ARGUMENT FOR RETURN OF HIS WEAPON.; 11:02; CLOSING ARGUMENTS PRESENTED BY LAURA L. CRANE, FOR PETITIONER.; 11:03; CLOSING ARGUMENTS PRESENTED BY PAUL T TOMSEN,FOR RESPONDENT.; COURT FINDS:; PETITION DENIED; COURT ORDERS WEAPONS TO BE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO PENAL CODE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); DISPOSITION COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION DENIED; CASE CLOSED.; ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER, LAURA L. CRANE IS TO PREPARE ORDER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • FILE TO S31

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2011
  • REPLY TO PET SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: #2-TO EXCLUDE PARAGR 4 OF OFCR BRESLINS DEC FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: #3-EXCLUDE PG 2/PARA 2 OF OFCR BRESLINS REPORT FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: #4-EXCLUDE PG 2/PARAG 3 OF OFCR BRESLINS REPORT FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION FILED AS TO HENRY SALCIDO GOMEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER BRESLIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant