This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 22:53:43 (UTC).

IN RE: CHIRINOS VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 IN RE CHIRINOS filed an Other lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9808

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Claimants

ANDY JOSE MONTENEGRO CHIRINOS

MONTENEGRO CHIRINOS, ANDY JOSE

Respondents

ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY

ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KIML BENSEN

4141 Inland Empire Bl Ste 305

Ontario, CA 91764-5034

Law Offices of Kim L Bensen

Attorney at Law Offices of Kim L Bensen

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling Filed

03/09/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

03/02/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

03/02/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Order Filed Re:

03/02/2021: Order Filed Re:

Order Re: Filed

03/02/2021: Order Re: Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/02/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Motion for Order

01/19/2021: Motion for Order

Notice Filed

12/22/2020: Notice Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/16/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/16/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/16/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service Filed

11/09/2020: Proof of Service Filed

MOTION RE- COMPEL CLAIMANT TO ANSWER FORM-SPECIAL

10/15/2020: MOTION RE- COMPEL CLAIMANT TO ANSWER FORM-SPECIAL

NOTICE OF MISSING FEE'S SENT. PLEASE SUBMIT MISSIN

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF MISSING FEE'S SENT. PLEASE SUBMIT MISSIN

NOTICE IMAGED

09/16/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

09/16/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/16/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

09/16/2020: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketArbitration - Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: / OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStatus Hearing on Petition; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: NR ON RESPONDENT'S PETITION FOR THE COURT TO SELECT AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: copy of minute order dated 03/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: Granting Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: Court's Ruling on Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for Order from the Court to Appoint an Arbitrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-03275; BOSCO Legal Services; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $645.00; Total Payments and Credits: $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment: $90.00; Total Payments and Credits: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAttorney Added for Defendant; Comment: ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITYCOMPANY, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF KIM L BENSEN ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ANDY JOSE MONTENEGRO CHIRINOS IS ADDED AS A CLAIMANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 200925-0273-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200925-0273-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 11838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSet Default Department to; Comment: SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed (Civil); Comment: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMINITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL STATE INSURANCE is a litigant